Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0831 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023