House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1210 (Ch. 2023-84)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|