Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0841 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2023