House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 770 (Ch. 2023-117)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/SB 770
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
PCS added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda - Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|