Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0861 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023