House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed |