Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0889 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023