Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 10, 2023