House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 106 (Ch. 2023-20) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed |