House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 892 (Ch. 2023-222)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|