Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0917 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023