|
05/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-83
|
|
|
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 958
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 82, NAYS 34
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|