Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023