Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0933 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023