|
07/07/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-331
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|