Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0945 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023