Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0955 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 9, 2023