|
06/02/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-185
|
|
|
|
06/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1056
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|