Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0959 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 5, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023