Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
PCS added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|