Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0973 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023