Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0977 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023