House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
PCS added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|