Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 29, 2023