House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |