House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Original reference removed: Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
PCS added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|