Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 108, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 126071 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|