Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023