Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023