Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023