|
06/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-287
|
|
|
|
06/23/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1098
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|