Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 26, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023