|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-165; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2023-166)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for SB 1446
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|