Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023