Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023