House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Filed |