House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 538 (Ch. 2023-249)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|