Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023