Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023