House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 724 (Ch. 2023-47)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|