Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023