Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023