Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023