|
06/29/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-306
|
|
|
|
06/28/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|