Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023