Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023