House | 05/05/2023 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |