|
07/05/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-314
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1586
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 281045 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 675901 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 305529 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 322241 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 933535 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 411101 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 980291 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 333853 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 425923 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 400005 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 420231 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 027367 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 174509 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 278405 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 562971 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 975813 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 844851 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 743705 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 771903 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 310265 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 930231 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 836145 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 135455 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|