|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-238
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1436
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|