Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023